Bailey v. McNeal et al
Plaintiff: James Ray Bailey
Defendant: Lt. McNeal and Unknown Female Officer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00443
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order re: #6 Response from Mobile Community Based Facility. Plaintiff is to pay Filing Fee NLT 12/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/23/2021. Copy to Plaintiff. (meh)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re: #5 Order filed by the Mobile Community Based Facility regarding inmate funds. Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU). (meh)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #4 Response filed by James Ray Bailey. The Warden of the Mobile Community Based Facility is DIRECTED to advise the court by 12/3/2021 if Bailey has funds available to him to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/16/2021. (meh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #3 Order DENYING Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Ray Bailey. Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU). (meh)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Ray Bailey. Plaintiff must REMIT to the Clerk of Court a money order for $402.00 within 21 days as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/25/2021. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Ray Bailey. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (meh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. McNeal and Unknown Female Officer filed by James Ray Bailey. Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU) (meh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. McNeal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ray Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Female Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?