Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Plaintiff: Becky Chedester, Michael Chedester, Lee Booker and Terri Lee
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG, Knauf International GmbH, Knauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf UK GmbH, Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG, Knauf DO Brasil LTD, PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd, Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Co. Ltd. and Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Case Number: 1:2021cv00447
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Daniel J. Dysart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/16/2021. (ktw)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kerry J. Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/16/2021. (ktw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kerry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION and APPLICATION for Daniel J. Dysart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2906707, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dysart, Daniel)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION and APPLICATION for Kerry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2906700, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Miller, Kerry)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry James Miller on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Miller, Kerry)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Dysart on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dysart, Daniel)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Rebekka C. Veith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/09/2021. (ktw)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 MOTION and APPLICATION for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ryan Dodson on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dodson, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION and APPLICATION for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2903284, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eastern District of Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing) (Veith, Rebekka)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:14-cv-02204. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court severs and transfers certain plaintiffs, as listed in the order, to the FLSD, ALSD, FLMD, MSSD, and TXSD, DISMISSES plaintiffs, A. DSouza, B. Desjardins, N. Khan, A. Kjos, and R. Swanson, and orders plaintiffs counsel to file a fifth amended complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this order, as more fully set in order; original electronic record will be uploaded to the Clerks of Court where the parties are being transferred to within 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/22/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #23 Order filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Due to damage caused by Hurricane Ida, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to submit the proposed order referenced in the 30 Order issued on 8/30/2021 from 9/7/2021 until 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/1/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The parties are to submit an updated proposed order by 9/7/2021 which clearly and explicitly states which plaintiffs' cases are to be severed, which court those plaintiffs' cases are to be transferred to and which plaintiffs' cases are to be retained, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/30/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Amended MOTION Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Motion for Entry of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION For Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2021; James Doyle present for plaintiffs; Michael Dodson and Kerry Miller present for defendants; Parties discussed current posture of the case. Parties to submit a proposed order for severance and transfer not later than May 5, 2021. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry James Miller by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel John Dysart by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3823378 (B4601112799). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-382336 (B460112798). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021, at 2:30 p.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Report of Mediator - Mediation was Unsuccessful by Brad Wash. filed by Brad Wash (Wash, R) Modified on 4/15/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to conduct mediation is hereby extended to April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/15/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Dodson on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Victor Doyle, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doyle, James) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021; James Doyle, Jr. present for plaintiff; The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ordered to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ordered to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ORDERED to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/4/21. (BJL) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/01/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET SHEET for Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) (KEK, ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Judge Inge P Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL 2047 In re: Chinese-Manufactured Drywall Products Liability Litigation; certified copy of docket entries and documents electronically sent to transferee clerk in Eastern District of Louisiana. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. (CTS, )12/8/14. [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Knauf Insulation GmbH. Delivered via certified mail. (PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Luciana Bado, Elizabeth Bennett, Jennifer Brady, CDO Investments LLC, Mary Sue Caranna, Damian Cason, Mardechria Charles, Bonnie Cordier, Ajesh D'Souza, Bill Desjardins, George Ferry, Stephanie Fussell, Michael Ginart, Jack Green, Tim Hoffman, Ike Ijemere, Jeremy Jordan, Noor Khan, Ashley Kjos, Paul J Kleinmann, MCF Enterprises Inc, Toni Macksey, Karen McCann, Mindy Milam, Ronald Pendelton, Peter Robinson, Jason Scott, Rusty Swanson, Laura Veira, Jinxi Zhu. (Doyle, James) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2286113 (NDAL Receipt No. B460105755). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PSM). (Doyle, James) Modified on 11/14/2014 (PSM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 10/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Chedester
Represented By: James V Doyle, Jr
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chedester
Represented By: James V Doyle, Jr
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Booker
Represented By: James V Doyle, Jr
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lee
Represented By: James V Doyle, Jr
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf International GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Insulation GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf UK GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf DO Brasil LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?