Martin v. Dunn
Petitioner: George Martin
Respondent: Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 1:2021cv00460
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order, Res is to answer & show cause, on or before 1/10/2022 why the writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/9/21. (copy mailed to Plf on 11/10/21; copies of Order & #1 Petition mailed to Respondent Jefferson S. Dunn & Attorney General of the State of Alabama, by certified mail, on 11/10/21) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2021: #1 Mail Banner - Attorney General, #2 Mail Banner - Commissioner Dunn) (cjr).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon a review of the motion and application for admission pro hac vice of Harper Gernet-Girard, it is hereby ORDERED, adjudged, and decreed that counselor Harper Gernet-Girard, Esquire, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Central District of California (Doc. 8-1, PageID. 119), who has complied with the rules of this Court (Doc. 8, PageID. 117-18), be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10-29-21. (lly)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon a review of the motion and application for admission pro hac vice of David Debold, it is hereby ORDERED, adjudged, and decreed that counselor David Debold, Esquire, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia (Doc. 7-1, PageID. 116), who has complied with the rules of this Court (Doc. 7, PageID. 113-14), be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10-29-21. (lly)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Harper Gernet-Girard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2898727, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by George Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gernet-Girard, Harper)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for David Debold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2898726, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by George Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Debold, David)
October 29, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Harper Gernet-Girard to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; and #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for David Debold to Appear Pro Hac Vice;Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (mab)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/26/2021. (mab)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, GRANTING #4 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Nathaniel L. Bach. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/26/2021. (mab)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Nathaniel Bach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2896126, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by George Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Bach, Nathaniel)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for John H. Sharer, counsel for Plf George Martin, to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/25/21. (tot)
October 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for John H. Sharer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
October 22, 2021 REFERRAL OF #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Judge Moorer. (mab)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for John H. Sharer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2894769, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by George Martin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sharer, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by George Martin. (Filing fee $5, receipt number AALSDC-2894758, Online Credit Card Payment). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sharer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Martin
Represented By: John Sharer
Represented By: David Debold
Represented By: Harper Gernet-Girard
Represented By: Nathaniel Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?