Hargrove et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ralph Hargrove, Kimberly Hargrove, Ralph A. Hargrove and Kimberly S. Hargrove
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00542
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph A. Hargrove, Kimberly S. Hargrove. United States of America (Department of the Treasury) served on 12/21/2021. (Graham, Allen) Modified on 1/10/2022 (tot).
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA c/o Hon. Merrick B. Garland by Ralph A. Hargrove, Kimberly S. Hargrove. (Graham, Allen) Modified on 12/27/2021 (tot).
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attny by Ralph A. Hargrove, Kimberly S. Hargrove. United States of America served on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (Graham, Allen) Modified on 12/27/2021 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2021: #1 Proof of Service) (tot).
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America (U.S. Attny, Department of the Treasury, & Attny Gen of the United States). (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Kimberly S. Hargrove, Ralph A. Hargrove (Graham, Allen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 Service Notice entered 12/14/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/28/2022. (copy mailed to Attny Nixon on 12/14/21) (tot)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2922239, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1040s, #2 Exhibit B - original form 1045, #3 Exhibit C - IRS letter, #4 Exhibit D - informal claim, #5 Exhibit E - protective refund claim) (Graham, Allen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2021: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2021: #7 Redacted Exhibit A - 1040s (Part 1), #8 Redacted Exhibit A - 1040s (Part 2), #9 Redacted Exhibit B - original form 1045, #10 Redcacted Exhibit C - IRS letter, (11) Redacted Exhibit D - informal claim, #12 Redacted Exhibit E - protective refund claim) (tot). Modified on 12/16/2021 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hargrove et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Hargrove
Represented By: C. Luke Nixon
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hargrove
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: C. Luke Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Hargrove
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Christopher Luke Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Hargrove
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Christopher Luke Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?