Brady v. City of Creola, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Brady
Defendant: City of Creola, Alabama, Frank Hammond and Gary Davis
Case Number: 1:2022cv00037
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to Gary Davis. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joshua Brady (Sherrod, Henry)
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joshua Brady (Sherrod, Henry)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/10/2022. (meh) (Additional attachment(s): #1 Consent Form)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Redditt on behalf of City of Creola, Alabama, Frank Hammond (Redditt, Mark)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Creola, Alabama, Frank Hammond. (Diard, Jaclyn)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Creola, Alabama, Gary Davis, Frank Hammond. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (fz)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joshua Brady corrected (Sherrod, Henry)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joshua Brady (Sherrod, Henry)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2954128, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joshua Brady. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/2/2022. (Sherrod, Henry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (fz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. City of Creola, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Brady
Represented By: Henry F. Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Creola, Alabama
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hammond
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?