Phillips v. Mack
Petitioner: Michael Benjamin Phillips
Respondent: Hoss Mack
Case Number: 1:2022cv00073
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of 2241 Petition served 4/11/2022 as to Sheriff Hoss Mack (meh)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Alan Starrett on behalf of Hoss Mack (Starrett, Marc)
April 13, 2022 REFERRAL OF #8 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Murray. (meh)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Hoss Mack. (Clements, Fred)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2241 petition and order on Respondent. Respondent to answer within 20 days of service as further set out. Copy of Order and Petition mailed to Respondent, and Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/8/2022. (meh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2022: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (meh).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #2 Petitioner's Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees in light of the Court's receipt of the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/8/22. (lto)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, Receipt # 1060050. (cjr)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Benjamin Phillips. Respondent is ORDERED to show cause by 4/12/2022 as to why Petitioner's funds cannot be released to the Court for payment of the filing fee in this habeas action. Copy of this order and #2 motion mailed to Respondent. Copy of this order mailed to Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/29/2022. (meh)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 Letter from Michael Phillips requesting update on case. Copy of Docket Sheet mailed to Petitioner. (meh)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Benjamin Phillips. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Benjamin Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits); ref to Judge Murray (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Benjamin Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hoss Mack
Represented By: Marc Alan Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?