Pickett v. First Heritage Credit
Plaintiff: Schuyler Pickett
Defendant: First Heritage Credit
Case Number: 1:2022cv00119
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #2 is GRANTED. This action is hereby DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/15/2022. (fz)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Schuyler Pickett; referred to Senior Judge Granade. (mab)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order GRANTING plaintiff extension until April 14, 2022, to file a response in opposition. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/07/2022. (fz)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by First Heritage Credit (APG)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant First Heritage Credit. (Windsor, Robert)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Heritage Credit. Response due by 4/4/2022. Reply due by 4/11/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/22/2022. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Blank Disclosure Statement form emailed to Defendant First Heritage Credit; Disclosure Statement Due 3/28/2022 pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1(a). (mab)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Heritage Credit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ross, Brett)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2980334, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by First Heritage Credit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Ross, Brett)
March 21, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickett v. First Heritage Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuyler Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Heritage Credit
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Robert D Windsor, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?