Pickett v. Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Schuyler Pickett
Defendant: Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00122
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
2 Judge: Terry F Moorer
3 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #2 is GRANTED. This action is hereby DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/15/2022. (fz)
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion #2 filed by Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.. (Poole, William)
April 14, 2022 REFERRAL OF #11 Reply to #10 Response to #2 Motion to Dismiss to Senior Judge Granade. (mab)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Schuyler Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit) (Pickett, Schuyler)
April 13, 2022 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Granade. (tot)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #6 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing. Plaintiff is GRANTED extension until April 14, 2022, to file a response in opposition. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/07/2022. Copy to plaintiff. (fz)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Acceptance Loan Company, Inc. (APG)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Acceptance Loan Company, Inc., First US Bank identifying Corporate Parent First US Bank for Acceptance Loan Company, Inc... (Poole, William)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: Dft's #2 MOTION to Dismiss. Any response in opposition should be filed NLT 4/4/2022. Any reply is to be filed NLT 4/11/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/23/22. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/24/22) (tot)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Case re-assigned to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. District Judge Terry F. Moorer, Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
March 23, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 3/29/2022. (tot)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/22/22. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/22/22) (tot)
March 22, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tot)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.. (Poole, William)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2980815, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by William Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Poole, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickett v. Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuyler Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceptance Loan Company, Inc.
Represented By: William Luther Chandler Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?