Scott v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tanzania Scott
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00148
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 2:22-cv-00520. (cjr)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Dft's #6 Motion to Transfer & TRANSFERRING this case to the Southern Division of the NDAL as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/26/22. (tot)
April 25, 2022 REFERRAL OF #6 MOTION to Transfer to Judge Granade. (tot) Modified on 4/26/2022 (tot).
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer filed by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Nettles, Laura)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order, Dft Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., is to IMMEDIATELY establish cause, NLT close of business on 4/25/2022, why this action should not be REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County or instead TRANSFERRED to the Southern Division of the Northern District of Alabama as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/21/22. (tot)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Nettles, Laura)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Nettles, Laura)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee received over the phone $ 402.00, receipt number 1060120. (fz)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nettles, Laura) Modified on 4/20/2022 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2022: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanzania Scott
Represented By: John Griffin Watts
Represented By: Myles Stanley Herring, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Laura C. Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?