Qualls v. Butler
Petitioner: Michael Anthony Qualls
Respondent: Reosha Butler
Case Number: 1:2022cv00182
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 3:22-cv-00750. (cjr)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: re #3 Report and Recommendation. After due and proper consideration of the issues raised, and there having been no objections filed, the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge made under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and dated May 10, 2022, is ADOPTED as the opinion of this court and this action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Northwestern Division. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/15/2022. (fz) Copy to petitioner.
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is RECOMMENDED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama (Northwestern Division). Any party who objects to this recommendation or anything in it must, within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this document, file specific written objections with the Clerk of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/10/2022. Copy to petitioner. (fz)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 1060200 (cjr)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Anthony Qualls. (referred to MJ Murray (PSU) on 05/04/2022) (cjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualls v. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Anthony Qualls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reosha Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?