Ahmed v. Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela A. Ahmed
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. and Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00190
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 filed by Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (khc)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. and Medical Device Business Services, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/20/2022. (ctn)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay pending MDL Transfer. If Defendants have not yet filed their responsive pleadings, they shall do so either as directed by the District Court in MDL No. 2244 if the action is transferred, or if the action is not transferred, within 30 days of denial of transfer. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/20/2022. (meh)
May 19, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer to Judge DuBose. (meh)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer filed by Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medical Device Business Services, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc... (Babington, Joseph)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-cv-2022-900583., filed by Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Babington, Joseph)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on #1 Notice of Removal. Amended Notice of Removal that corrects addressed deficiencies to be filed and served NLT 5/18/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statements to be filed NLT 5/18/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/11/2022. (meh)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Notice of Removal to State Court (Babington, Joseph)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3008539, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A) (Babington, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. H. Babington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela A. Ahmed
Represented By: John D. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?