Spanish Fort Water System v. North Baldwin Utilities
Plaintiff: Spanish Fort Water System
Defendant: North Baldwin Utilities
Case Number: 1:2022cv00210
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Brief filed by North Baldwin Utilities re #20 Order,, Set Deadlines, - Defendant's Amended Post-Hearing Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 North Baldwin Utilities' unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Post-Hearing Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/22/2022. (khc)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Post-Hearing Reply Brief in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Post-Hearing Reply Brief in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Judge DuBose. (meh)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #23 Evidentiary Material, #24 Reply Brief to Judge DuBose. (meh)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant North Baldwin Utilities re: #20 Order,, Set Deadlines, - Defendant's Post-Hearing Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Evidentiary Material filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Padgett) (Betbeze, Jaime)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff Exhibits (bookmarked) admitted at Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on July 5, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Exhibits (bookmarked)) (nah)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #21 Brief to Judge DuBose. (meh)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Brief filed by Spanish Fort Water System re #20 Order,, Set Deadlines, Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spanish Fort Water System. (Engelhardt, Todd)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spanish Fort Water System. The Motion was heard July 5, 2022. Plaintiff Spanish Fort shall file its post-hearing brief on or before 7/11/2022. Defendant NBU shall file its responsive post-hearing brief on or before 7/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/6/2022. (meh)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Motion Hearing held on 7/5/2022 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spanish Fort Water System. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. (nah)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime W. Betbeze on behalf of North Baldwin Utilities (Betbeze, Jaime)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus E. McDowell on behalf of North Baldwin Utilities (McDowell, Marcus)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Marshall Gardner on behalf of North Baldwin Utilities (Gardner, J.)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Combs Diard on behalf of North Baldwin Utilities (Diard, Jaclyn)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay M. Ross on behalf of Spanish Fort Water System (Ross, Jay)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/23/2022. (meh)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Affidavit of Ercil Godwin, #2 Affidavit - Affidavit of Jason Padgett) (Redditt, Mark)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by North Baldwin Utilities. (Redditt, Mark)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order GRANTING #10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by North Baldwin Utilities. Defendant to file answer or other response to Complaint (doc. #1 ) and its response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (doc. #2 ) on or before 6/22/2022. The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (doc. #9 ) is MOOT. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/14/2022. (meh)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Redditt, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by North Baldwin Utilities. (Redditt, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge DuBose (nah)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Spanish Fort Water System. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Spanish Fort Water System (Milling, Bert)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Spanish Fort Water System. (Douglas, Danielle)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant North Baldwin Utilities shall file its response by 6/15/2022. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/5/2022 at 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. The Clerk is DIRECTED To send a copy of the complaint, the motion, and this Order to North Baldwin Utilities, 25 Hand Avenue, Bay Minette, Alabama 36507. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/1/2022. (meh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Baldwin Utilities. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Reassigned to U.S. District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (meh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spanish Fort Water System. (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against North Baldwin Utilities ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3017671, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Spanish Fort Water System. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge DuBose. (meh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Steele (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spanish Fort Water System v. North Baldwin Utilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spanish Fort Water System
Represented By: Todd David Engelhardt
Represented By: Aubrey Patrick Dungan
Represented By: Danielle Elysees Douglas
Represented By: Jay M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Baldwin Utilities
Represented By: J. Marshall Gardner
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Marcus E. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?