Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association v. Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association
Defendant: Belfor USA Group, Inc. doing business as Belfor Property Restoration
Counter Claimant: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00239
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Set Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 11:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, filed August 8, 2022. (Doc. 16). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference on August 25, 2022, at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 5A, United States Courthouse, Mobile, Alabama, as it is the undersigned's belief that bringing the parties and the Court together at this stage promotes efficiency in the litigation process, helps avoid discovery disputes, provides a clearer path to pretrial resolution, and allows counsel to pose questions to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(B) (providing that a magistrate judge must issue a scheduling order "after consulting with the parties' attorneys... at a scheduling conference."). Out of town counsel may attend the scheduling conference by telephone in lieu of attendance in person by filing a notice with the Court and using the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN NO.: 571-353-2301 and Guest ID: 002111803. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/11/22. (lto)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association; Responses due by 8/24/2022; Replies due by 8/31/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 9/1/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/10/2022. (cjr)
August 9, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , referred to Judge Beaverstock. (cjr)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. (McClurkin, John)
August 8, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protocol for Production of ESI) (Butler, M.)
July 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2022 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum in Support filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association/ Court Reporter Cheryl Powell. (mbp)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for reasons stated on the record. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/14/22. (cmj)
July 13, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum in Support filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott)
July 13, 2022 REFERRAL OF #14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
July 12, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. (McClurkin, John)
July 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Stevens on behalf of Belfor USA Group, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
July 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John William McClurkin on behalf of Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association (McClurkin, John)
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Plaintiff Colony Club At Drake's Landing Owners Association reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum in Support filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. The Motion for Expedited Hearing (doc. 8) is granted. Responses due by 7/13/2022. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/6/22. (cmj)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. (Perry, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum in Support filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Exhibit Ex E) (Perry, James)
July 6, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memorandum in Support to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
July 6, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association. (Perry, James)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/24/2022. (meh)
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Counter Claimant Belfor USA Group, Inc., Defendant Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Butler, M.)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Belfor's Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Final Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Intent, #5 Exhibit E - Recorded Verified Statement of Lien, #6 Exhibit F - May 6, 2022 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - May 12, 2022 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - May 13, 2022 Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Complaint) (Butler, M.)
June 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3028506, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Recorded Verified Statement of Lien, #4 Exhibit 3 - Circuit Court file, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Service on Belfor, #6 Exhibit 5 - Alabama Secretary of State Entity Information, #7 Exhibit 6 - Belfor's Invoices and Statement, #8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Brief, #9 Exhibit 8 - Zillow Listings of units for sale) (Butler, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association v. Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Club At Drakes Landing Owners Association
Represented By: Daniel H. Caven
Represented By: James Lynn Perry
Represented By: John William McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor USA Group, Inc. doing business as Belfor Property Restoration
Represented By: Ann Chapman
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Chapman
Represented By: M. Warren Butler
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?