Clemons v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Clemons
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00246
Filed: June 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING BELO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02322. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/14/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vernon Clemons re #9 Status Conference,, Supplemental Initial Disclosures. (Pereira, Laura) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Status Conference held on 5/9/2022. The Court ordered Plaintiff to file a supplemental initial disclosure expressly stating that there is no new information to disclose, which must contain an original signature and current date, on or before Monday, May 23, 2022. As the issues regarding Plaintiff's disclosures have been addressed, Defendant BP need not include this matter in next month's Category 2 status report. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. re #6 Notice of Compliance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court's #5 Show Cause Order is SATISFIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/22/2022. (Originally filed in master case no. 10-md-2179 at R. Doc. 27377.)(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Vernon Clemons re #5 Order,,,. (Pereira, Laura) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than MAY 13, 2022, plaintiffs JULIO CESAR BONILLA AND VERNON CLEMONS must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the deadline by which plaintiffs must submit their venue filings is extended to no later than JUNE 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/13/2022. (Originally filed in master case 10-2179 at R. Doc. 27373). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/13/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2.. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9151091) filed by Vernon Clemons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Vernon Clemons (pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Clemons
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Laura Pereira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?