Castleberry v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Anthony Castleberry
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00254
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 10 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING BELO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00500. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/28/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9249510) filed by Samuel Anthony Castleberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Samuel Anthony Castleberry(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castleberry v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Anthony Castleberry
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?