James v. Raybon et al
Plaintiff: Joe Nathan James, Jr.
Defendant: Terry Raybon, John Hamm and Steve Marshall
Case Number: 1:2022cv00285
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Mail Returned as to Alabama Department of Corrections re: #3 Order. (Referred to J/Moorer on 8/17/22) (tot)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed, John Hamm served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Steve Marshall served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Terry Raybon served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (tot)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of #8 Memorandum Opinion & Order served 7/27/22 as to Joe Nathan James, Jr. (tot)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of #3 Order served 7/25/22 as to Terry Raybon & Joe Nathan James. (tot)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion & Order to Plf by overnight mail & to send a copy to the Warden, by either electronic mail or facsimile, w/instructions that a copy of this Memorandum Opinion & Order be given to Plf immediately upon receipt. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/25/22. (copy to Plf by UPS overnight mail on 7/25/22; e-mailed to Warden Raybon & his assistant on 7/19/22) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2022: #1 UPS Tracking Information) (meh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2022: #2 UPS Overnight Receipt) (tot).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Mitchell Johnson on behalf of John Hamm, Steve Marshall, Terry Raybon (Johnson, Henry)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Hamm, Steve Marshall, Terry Raybon. (Attachment: #1 USPS Banner Pages) (tot)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Objection re: #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Anderson, Richard)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of #3 Order served 7/21/22 as to John Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections. (tot)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of #3 Order served 7/21/22 as to Steve Marshall, Alabama Attorney General. (tot)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dearman Anderson on behalf of John Hamm, Steve Marshall, Terry Raybon (Anderson, Richard)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. (SEE DOCS. #1 & #3 ) (tot)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. It is ORDERED that the Court is treating the #1 Complaint as one containing a request for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a response to the Preliminary Injunction on or before 5:00 p.m. on 7/22/2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this information to Defendants by overnight expedited mail. Copy to Plaintiff and Defendants by overnight mail in addition to the normal means of service. Email to Defendants for notification purposes. Copy to Account Manager at Holman. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/20/2022. (meh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2022: #1 UPS Overnight Receipts) (tot).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (fz)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against John Hamm, Steve Marshall, Terry Raybon, filed by Joe Nathan James, Jr. Referred to Judge Moorer. (fz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Raybon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Nathan James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Raybon
Represented By: Henry Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Richard Dearman Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hamm
Represented By: Henry Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Richard Dearman Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Marshall
Represented By: Henry Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Richard Dearman Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?