Billingsley v. Marion Military Institute et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Donald Billingsley
Defendant: Marion Military Institute and Peter Tutt
Case Number: 1:2022cv00345
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:22-cv-00487. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1. Plf's #4 objections are OVERRULED; 2. The Magistrate Judge's #3 Recommendation is ADOPTED; 3. This case is TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1391(b) and 28 USC 1404(a); The Clerk is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action; This case is closed in this Court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/31/2022. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]
August 31, 2022 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 (Motion for) OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation by Jerry Donald Billingsley. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS this case be TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1391(b) and 28 USC 1404(a), as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/17/2022. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jerry Donald Billingsley. (bll, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Marion Military Institute, Peter Tutt, filed by Jerry Donald Billingsley.(bll, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. Marion Military Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Donald Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Military Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Tutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?