68V BTR Holdings, LLC v. City of Fairhope et al
Plaintiff: 68V BTR Holdings, LLC
Defendant: City of Fairhope and City of Fairhope Planning Commission
Case Number: 1:2022cv00430
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #18 Reply Brief to Judge Steele. (cmj)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission. (Williams, Christopher)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC. (Bordenkircher, Ty)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by City of Fairhope Planning Commission, City of Fairhope. (Steele, William)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission. (Williams, Christopher)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs 68V BTR Holdings, LLC, 68V BTR Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 68V BTR Holdings, LLC for 68V BTR Holdings, LLC.. (Bordenkircher, Ty)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Fairhope Planning Commission, City of Fairhope. Responses due by 12/12/2022; Replies due by 12/19/2022; Motion to be taken under submission on 12/19/2022. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/6/22. (cmj)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Van Haneghan on behalf of City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission (Van Haneghan, Emily)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Bordenkircher on behalf of 68V BTR Holdings, LLC (Bordenkircher, Gregory)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Darnley Cooper on behalf of City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (cmj)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subdivision Regulations effective Nov. 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Action The Gables, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Action Skyline Village, #4 Exhibit D - Feb. 2022 PC Minutes, #5 Exhibit E - April 2022 PC Minutes, #6 Exhibit F - May 2022 PC Minutes) (Williams, Christopher)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Return of Service Executed City of Fairhope served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022; City of Fairhope Planning Commission served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (SEE IMAGE at doc. 8) (cmj)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Exhibits; Ordinance served on City of Fairhope, c/o Lisa Hanks on 11/07/2022, filed by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Proofs of Service) (Bordenkircher, Ty)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Reassigned to District Judge William H. Steele. Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (srd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Fairhope, City of Fairhope Planning Commission. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (srd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 10/28/2022. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/28/2022. (srd)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC as to City of Fairhope. (Bordenkircher, Ty) Modified on 10/28/2022 (srd).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC as to City of Fairhope Planning Commission. (Bordenkircher, Ty) Modified on 10/28/2022 (srd).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3094113, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by 68V BTR Holdings, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Bordenkircher, Ty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 68V BTR Holdings, LLC v. City of Fairhope et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 68V BTR Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ty Ramsey Bordenkircher
Represented By: Gregory A. Bordenkircher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairhope
Represented By: Christopher Scott Williams
Represented By: Emily Van Haneghan
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Darnley Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairhope Planning Commission
Represented By: Christopher Scott Williams
Represented By: Emily Van Haneghan
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Darnley Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?