Andrews v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tanya Andrews
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (tot)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/22/22. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #5 , #7 Disclosure Statements filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/19/2022. (ctn)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. The disclosure statement, which is not on the Court's form, cites only Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and its disclosures are consistent only with that rule. This is insufficient because the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is ORDERED to file an amended or supplemental disclosure statement that certifies disclosure required by S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than 12/22/2022 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/15/2022. (ctn)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanya Andrews. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022 (Williams, Miles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2022: #1 Proof of Service) (tot).
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3096419, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tanya Andrews. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #3 Summons) (Williams, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Andrews
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lynch Yeilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?