Roberts v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard James Roberts
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00482
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Solomon Schae Thomas on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Thomas, Solomon)
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles David Durkee on behalf of Richard James Roberts (Durkee, Charles)
December 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Little, Jonathan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gilchrist, Wesley)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING BELO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-02329. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/1/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9465181) filed by Richard James Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Richard James Roberts(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/2/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard James Roberts
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Solomon Schae Thomas
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Solomon Schae Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?