McDonald v. Grimsley et al
Plaintiff: David A. McDonald
Defendant: Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr., Liberty Rent, LLC and Data Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00464
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Strike #28 Reply Brief In Support of #2 Motion to Seal Complaint filed by Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Betbeze, Jaime)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #29 Reply to Response to #18 Motion to Remand; and #30 Response to #28 Motion to Strike Judge Nelson. (mab)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion #18 Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Remand filed by David A. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Emails, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Warranty) (Marchand, Chad)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #26 Reply, 27 Sealed Document; and #28 Motion to Strike Reply Brief In Support of #2 Motion to Seal Complaint to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (mab)
January 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Strike Liberty Rent, LLC, Data Holdings, Inc. and Darrell Wayne Grimsley Jr's #28 Reply Brief In support of their #2 Motion to Seal Complaint, filed by David A. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1-5-2024 e-mails, #2 Exhibit B - 1-12-2024- emails) (Marchand, Chad)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Defendants' Reply in Support of #2 Motion to Seal Complaint re: #22 Objection filed by Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the Motion to Seal Complaint (Doc. 2) is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate resolution in conjunction with the motion to remand. REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge: #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr., Data Holdings, Inc., Liberty Rent, LLC. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 01/12/2024. (KJA)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #24 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Nelson. (tot)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Betbeze, Jaime)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #21 MOTION to Stay, or in the Alternative, MOTION For Additional Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, as follows: Briefing on the motions to dismiss filed 12/15/2023 #9 #10 is STAYED pending disposition of the motion to remand filed 12/28/2023 #18 . The Court will enter a new briefing schedule on the motions to dismiss should remand be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/5/2024. (ctn)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Plaintiff's Objection and Response in Opposition to Defendants' #2 Motion to Seal, filed by David A. McDonald. (Marchand, Chad)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #22 Objection & Response in Opposition to Motion to Seal to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Stay, or in the Alternative, MOTION For Additional Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by David A. McDonald. (Marchand, Chad). (Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 1/4/2024) (tot).
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 MOTION to Stay, or in the Alternative, MOTION For Additional Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tot)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #20 Joint Status Report to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Liberty Rent, LLC, Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Data Holdings, Inc.. (Barnes, Jake)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by David A. McDonald. District Judge referred said motion to Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (12/29/2023 elec. ref.). Defendants' brief in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than 1/11/2024. Plaintiff's brief in reply to the response, if any, must be filed and served no later than 1/18/2024. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 5(a) and CivLR 7 for briefing technical requirements. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/19/2024. Except as permitted by the Court's Local Rules, e.g., S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), no other briefing or submissions addressing the subject motion may be filed without leave of the Court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/29/2023. (ctn)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (fz)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by David A. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Baldwin County Record, #2 Exhibit B - Soldier Creek Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Divorce Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Divorce Testimony, #5 Exhibit E - AlaCourt Docket, #6 Exhibit F - Divorce Cert., #7 Exhibit G - Soldier Creek Prop Tax, #8 Exhibit H - Pasquill Aff., #9 Exhibit I - Photos and Affidavit, #10 Exhibit J - Mougey Warranty Deed, #11 Exhibit K - Morgey Prop Tax, #12 Exhibit L - Levin Papantonio Website, #13 Exhibit M - McDonald Affidavit, #14 Exhibit N - Data Holdings N.C. Annual Report, #15 Exhibit O - Baldwin County Tax) (Marchand, Chad)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Marchand on behalf of David A. McDonald (Marchand, Chad)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bowron on behalf of David A. McDonald (Bowron, Edward)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr., Data Holdings, Inc., Liberty Rent, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (tot)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Baldwin County, Alabama, case number CV-2023-901336., filed by Liberty Rent, LLC, Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Data Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #14 Amended Notice of Removal to Judge Moorer. (tot)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr., and #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Data Holdings, Inc. and Liberty Rent, LLC. District Judge referred said motions to Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (12/15/2023 elec. ref.). Plaintiff's brief(s) in response to said motions, if any, must be filed and served no later than 1/5/2024, which is also the deadline for Plaintiff to amend the complaint once as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) advisory committees note to 2009 amendment (explaining that the current version of Rule 15(a)(1) was enacted to "force the pleader to consider carefully and promptly the wisdom of amending to meet the arguments in [a Rule 12(b), (e), or (f)] motion[, as a] responsive amendment may avoid the need to decide the motion or reduce the number of issues to be decided..."). Movants' brief(s) in reply to the response(s), if any, must be filed and served no later than 1/16/2024. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 5(a) and CivLR 7 for briefing technical requirements. Motions to be taken under submission on 1/17/2024. Except as permitted by the Court's Local Rules, e.g., S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), no other briefing or submissions addressing the subject motions may be filed without leave of the Court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, these motions are being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/18/2023. (ctn)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #11 , #5 Disclosure Statements filed by Data Holdings, Inc. and Liberty Rent, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/18/2023. (ctn)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr. (ctn)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Data Holdings, Inc., Liberty Rent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr. (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law, #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tot)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #1 Notice of Removal. Dfts are to file & serve, NLT 12/20/2023, an amended Notice of Removal that corrects the deficiencies as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/12/23. (tot)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Data Holdings, Inc. While said disclosure statement says that it is giving notice under both "Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Southern District of Alabama Civil Local Rules[,]" the disclosure language with regard to Data Holdings, Inc. tracks only that of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1). This is inadequate for two reasons: (1) the disclosure requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, see S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement shall identify the represented entity's general nature and shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."); and (2) the statement fails to disclose information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) (as amended effective Dec. 1, 2022) in diversity cases such as this one. Data Holdings, Inc. is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement correcting the foregoing deficiencies, using this Court's current form, no later than 12/19/2023 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/12/2023. (ctn)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: Dfts' #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint. The current matters will remain provisionally sealed pending the Court's final determination on the issue of sealing. The parties are to file a joint status report on or before 1/2/2024 as set out. Plf's shall file a response to Dfts' motion on or before 1/5/2024. Dfts may file a reply, if they wish to do so, on or before 1/12/2024. The court will determine if a hearing is necessary after it receives the joint status report(s) & additional briefing. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/11/23. (tot)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Data Holdings, Inc., Liberty Rent, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (cle)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC - Notice of Objection to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Data Holdings, Inc., Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Liberty Rent, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405, Receipt number AALSDC-3314551, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Liberty Rent, LLC, Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr, Data Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Betbeze, Jaime)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document and REFERRAL OF 3 Sealed Document(s) to Judge Beaverstock. (jmr)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Answer due from All Defendants by 12/15/2023. (jmr)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Grimsley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. McDonald
Represented By: James B. Pittman, Jr
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Wayne Grimsley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Jake F. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Rent, LLC
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Jake F. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Jake F. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?