Frioux v. The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hope Frioux
Defendant: The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc. doing business as Washington County Hospital and Nursing Home
Case Number: 1:2024cv00260
Filed: July 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement) (Palmer, Lynlee)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement. The parties must refile said motion with the settlement agreement attached as an exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/19/2024. (ctn)
September 18, 2024 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.. (Palmer, Lynlee)
August 21, 2024 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Verification of Hours #11 filed by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.; Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to the Court's Interrogatories #8 filed by Hope Frioux (ctn)
August 20, 2024 Filing 11 SPECIAL REPORT filed by Defendant The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verification of Hours Worked) (Palmer, Lynlee)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/19/2024. (meh)
August 16, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc... (Palmer, Lynlee)
August 16, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Responses to the Court's Interrogatories filed by Hope Frioux. (Rosenthal, Ian)
August 16, 2024 REFERRAL OF #9 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 14, 2024 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (BBB)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 9/4/2024. Verified Summary due by 9/25/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 11/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh)
August 12, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.. (Palmer, Lynlee)
August 12, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.. (Palmer, Lynlee)
August 8, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hope Frioux. The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc. waiver sent on 8/1/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Rosenthal, Ian)
July 30, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
July 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc., d/b/a Washington County Hospital and Nursing Home ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3435193, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Frioux. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rosenthal, Ian) Modified on 7/30/2024 (fz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frioux v. The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Frioux
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Represented By: Ian David Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Washington County Health Care Authority, Inc. doing business as Washington County Hospital and Nursing Home
Represented By: Lynlee Wells Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?