Patrick v. Tindle Construction
Plaintiff: Kevan Patrick
Defendant: Tindle Construction
Case Number: 1:2024cv00334
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 REFERRAL OF #11 Notice of Filing to Judge Cassady. (meh)
November 6, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Responses to Court's FLSA Interrogatories filed by Kevan Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Responses to the Court's Interrogatories) (Rosenthal, Ian)
October 17, 2024 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Tindle Construction. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
October 17, 2024 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Tindle Construction (Cassady, William)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: This Order REPLACES and WITHDRAWS the Preliminary Scheduling Order entered on October 15, 2024 (doc. #6 ). The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 11/6/2024. Verified Summary due by 11/27/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh)
October 15, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Tindle Construction. (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***WITHDRAWN per Order #8 *** PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh) Modified on 10/16/2024 (meh).
October 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevan Patrick. Tindle Construction served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024 (Rosenthal, Ian)
October 15, 2024 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (cle)
October 14, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Tindle Construction. (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
October 14, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tindle Construction. (Cooper, Lisa Michelle)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tindle Construction. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tindle Construction ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3458896, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kevan Patrick. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rosenthal, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Tindle Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tindle Construction
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Darnley Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevan Patrick
Represented By: Ian David Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?