Faris v. Dreamland Holding Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Teresa Faris
Defendant: Dreamland Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00381
Filed: October 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Answers to Court Interrogatories filed by Teresa Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Court Interrogatories) (Miller, Michael)
November 27, 2024 REFERRAL OF #15 Answer to Complaint to Judge DuBose. (meh)
November 26, 2024 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dreamland Holding Company, LLC. (Hilson, Henry)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re: #13 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Teresa Faris. Dreamland shall file any Response on or before 12/12/2024. Faris shall file any Reply on or before 12/19/2024. Motion to be taken under submission on 12/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/26/2024. (meh)
November 25, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Teresa Faris. (Miller, Michael)
November 25, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 12/3/2024. Verified Summary due by 12/24/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 1/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh)
November 12, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Dreamland Holding Company, LLC, Estate of Bobby Underwood, Abbie S. Drummond Marital Trust #2, Underwood Family Limited Partnership, Birmingham Dreamland, Inc., Mobile Dreamland, Inc., Dreamland Restaurants of Atlanta, Inc., Dreamland Duluth Operations, LLC, Dreamland Restaurants of Tuscaloosa, LLC, 280 Q, LLC, Dreamland Franchise, LLC, Hot Smoke Venture, LLC, Downtown Q, LLC, East Montgomery Q, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Estate of Bobby Underwood, Other Affiliate Abbie S. Drummond Marital Trust #2, Other Affiliate Underwood Family Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Birmingham Dreamland, Inc., Other Affiliate Mobile Dreamland, Inc., Other Affiliate Dreamland Restaurants of Atlanta, Inc., Other Affiliate Dreamland Duluth Operations, LLC, Other Affiliate Dreamland Restaurants of Tuscaloosa, LLC, Other Affiliate 280 Q, LLC, Other Affiliate Dreamland Franchise, LLC, Other Affiliate Hot Smoke Venture, LLC, Other Affiliate Downtown Q, LLC, Other Affiliate East Montgomery Q, LLC for Dreamland Holding Company, LLC.. (Hilson, Henry)
November 12, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dreamland Holding Company, LLC. (Hilson, Henry)
November 4, 2024 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/29/24. (cmj)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jordan Richards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/29/24. (cmj)
October 25, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael V. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3482251, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Teresa Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing from U.S. District Court for Southern District of Florida for Michael V. Miller, Esq.) (Miller, Michael)
October 25, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jordan Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3482234, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Teresa Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from U.S. District Court for Southern District of Florida for Jordan Richards, Esq.) (Richards, Jordan)
October 25, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael V. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jordan Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (meh)
October 21, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Faris. Dreamland Holding Company, LLC served on 10/19/2024, answer due 11/12/2024 (Frisch, Andrew)
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew R. Frisch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/17/24. (cmj)
October 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dreamland Holding Company, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
October 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Andrew R. Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3475242, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Teresa Faris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Frisch, Andrew)
October 16, 2024 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Andrew R. Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (meh)
October 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dreamland Holding Company, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3474851, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Teresa Faris. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Dreamland Holding Company, LLC) (Fischer, Erby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faris v. Dreamland Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamland Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Bryance Metheny
Represented By: Amy Jordan Wilkes
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Faris
Represented By: Erby J. Fischer, II
Represented By: Michael V Miller
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?