Landrum v. State of Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Landrum
Defendant: State of Alabama, Marengo County District Attorney, Alabama Department of Corrections, Paul Whaley, Dewayne Estes, Cheryl Price, Gregory Griggs, Eddie Hardaway, Jr. and R. Brian Smith
Case Number: 2:2006cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
Presiding Judge: W B Hand
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2008 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Johnny Ray Landrum re #29 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #30 Judgment (srr)
February 8, 2008 Filing 30 JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge W. B. Hand on 2/8/08. (srr)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING #27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be dismissed with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and obey the orders of the court. Signed by Senior Judge W. B. Hand on 2/8/08. (srr)
February 5, 2008 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Johnny Ray Landrum re #27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Ref to Judge Milling/PSU (srr)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be dismissed with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and obey the orders of the court. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/16/08. (srr)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Special Report. Objections due by 8/3/2007. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 6/11/07. NEF mailed to Plaintiff and Gregory Griggs. (clr)
June 8, 2007 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections to Special Report by Johnny Ray Landrum. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (srr)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to the Special Report. Time EXTENDED to 6/8/2007. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 5/22/07. NEF mailed to Plaintiff and Counsel on 5/22/07 (clr)
May 16, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File objection to the special report by Johnny Ray Landrum. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (adk)
April 26, 2007 Filing 22 Letter from Johnny Ray Landrum dated 4/23/07 re: request for copy of original 1983 complaint (srr)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER converting Special Report #18 filed by Gregory Griggs to a motion for summary judgment and taking the motion under submission. Response to Motion due by 5/17/2007. Motion to be taken under submission on 5/18/2007. Disposition Deadline set to 5/17/2007. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 4/12/07. (srr)
April 12, 2007 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gregory Griggs. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (srr)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: #19 Letter stating Plaintiff's request is GRANTED as set out. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 2/12/07. Copies to parties on 2/13/07.(mpp)
February 7, 2007 Filing 19 Letter from Johnny Landrum re: status (srr)
August 21, 2006 Filing 18 SPECIAL REPORT filed by Defendants Gregory Griggs. Ref to Judge Milling/PSU (srr, )
August 21, 2006 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Gregory Griggs. Ref to Judge Milling/PSU(srr, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Gregory Griggs waiver sent on 7/28/2006, answer due 9/26/2006. (srr, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gregory Griggs on 7/25/06. Waiver of Service due by 8/25/2006. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(srr, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s), Gregory Griggs, in accordance with the Court's standing order dated February 1, 1994 paragraph a, b, or c. Special Report and Answer due within 60 days of mailing of waiver by Clerk. The Court is withholding service of process on the other defendants in the second amended complaint, Eddie Hardaway, Jr. and R. Brian Smith. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 7/25/06. (srr, )
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be DISCONTINUED from Prison Account of Johnnie Ray Landrum . The Court has received payments from the plaintiff totaling $250.00. Copy of this order mailed to Bibb County Correctional Facility and Alabama Dept. of Corrections Comm. as ordered. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 5/30/06. (adk )
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order that this action is before the court on plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; defendants are Gregory Griggs, R. Brian Smith and Eddie Hardaway, Jr. The 2nd amended complaint will now undergo the screeing process mandated when the court's limited resources and heavy caseload permit. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 5/30/06. (srr, )
May 5, 2006 Filing 11 Partial Filing fee: $ 125.00, receipt number 2687 (srr, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory Griggs, Eddie Hardaway, Jr, R. Brian Smith, State of Alabama, filed by Johnny Ray Landrum. Ref to Judge Milling/PSU(srr, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that plaintiff is to advise the court by 4/28/2006 if he does not want to proceed only on the claims in his amended complaint. If he does want to proceed only on the claims contained in his amended complaint, he is to file a Second Amended Complaint by 4/28/06. Clerk is directed to sent plaintiff form for a 1983 complaint. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 4/7/06. (srr, )
March 22, 2006 Filing 8 Partial Filing fee: $ 125.00, receipt number 2155; ref to Judge Milling/PSU (srr, )
March 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff to REMIT $12.16 by following deadline. Filing Fee due by 3/29/2006. Disposition Deadline set to 3/29/2006. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 3/9/06. (srr, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Ray Landrum. Referred to Judge Milling/PSU(srr, )
February 13, 2006 Filing 5 AMENDED 1983 COMPLAINT against Dewayne Estes, Cheryl Price, State of Alabama, filed by Johnny Ray Landrum. Ref to Judge Milling/PSU(srr, )
January 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order that by 2/24/06 plaintiff is to complete and file this court's forms for a 1983 complaint and motion to proceed without prepayment of fees or pay the $250.00 filing fee; Clerk is directed to send plaintiff 1983 form and Motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. on 1/27/06. (srr, )
January 3, 2006 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama, Western Division; Case Number 7:05-2381-LSC-HGD. Original file with documents numbered 1-2, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by Johnny Ray Landrum. (Attachments:, #1 1983 Complaint, #2 transfer order)(srr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrum v. State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marengo County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Griggs
Represented By: Gregory S. Griggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Hardaway, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Brian Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?