Hill v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Mary Anne Hill
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00590
Filed: October 8, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Marengo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION for Attorney Fees stating Plaintiff's attorney's Application be granted, without objection, and that Plaintiff's attorney, William T. Coplin, Jr., be awarded an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $1,456.83. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 1/12/10. (mjn, )
September 9, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION for Attorney Fees stating Plaintiff's attorney's Application be granted, without objection, and that Plaintiff'sattorney, William T. Coplin, Jr., be awarded an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $1,456.83. Objections to R&R due by 9/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/9/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
June 25, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Mary Anne Hill against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 6/25/09. (adk)
May 20, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Mary Anne Hill Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/20/09. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Hill
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?