Butt v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Hamid Ali Butt
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice and David O. Strieff
Case Number: 2:2008cv00672
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 12 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court finds that the petition for writ of habeas corpus is MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 04/17/2009. (mab)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The respondents have amended their response with a Release Notification which indicates petitioner will be released sometime in the future. It is clear to the undersigned that petitioner has not actually been released to date. Accordingly, the 10 the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered 3/19/09 remains in effect. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/10/09. copy to petitioner (srr)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this Court grant Hamid Ali Butt's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus & order his immediate supervised release under conditions as set forth by the ICE arm of the Department of Homeland Security. Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/19/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 3/20/09) (tot)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butt v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hamid Ali Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David O. Strieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?