Sturdivant v. Social Security Commissioner

Plaintiff: Morris Leander Sturdivant
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2009cv00126
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees entered in accordance with the order entered on this date. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that plaintiff be awarded reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $2,561.55 under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/8/10. (tgw)
December 8, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered In accordance with the order entered on this date. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying claimant benefits be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/8/09. (tgw)
November 19, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Morris Leander Sturdivant that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying plaintiff benefits be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of § 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/19/09. Copies to parties on 11/20/09.(mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdivant v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Leander Sturdivant
Represented By: Marilyn H. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?