ANZ USA, LLC et al v. Bush Hog, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ANZ USA, LLC and ANZ International Manufacturing Private Limited
Defendant: Bush Hog, LLC, CC Industries, Inc. and Henry Crown & Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv00228
Filed: April 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2012 228 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that all claims asserted by the plfs are dismissed with prejudice; that dfts' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice; and that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of dfts, Bush Hog, LLC and Henry Crown & Company, and against the plfs, AN Z International Manufacturing Private Limited and ANZ Advanced Technologies, LLC d/b/a ANZ USA, and plfs' principals, Irfan Sheriff and Rakesh Vashee, jointly and severally, in the amount of $335,241.50, representing attorneys' fees in the amount of $233,903.75 plus reimbursement for the fees and expenses paid to Bush Hog's expert, Professor Marc Galanter, in the amount of $101,337.75. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/27/2012. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 29, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 213 MOTION to Withdraw filed by ANZ USA, LLC, and ANZ International Manufacturing Private Limited. Upon receipt of the proof by Mr. Speagle and Mr. Zakaria, jointly or severally, that service of this Order and the 223 Report and Recommendation has been perfected on their clients, the Court will grant counsel's motion to withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/29/2012. (sdb)
March 5, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting 217 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 182 MOTION for Sanctions. The motion for sanctions is granted in part and denied in part as set out. Attorneys Speagle and Zakaria are to provide the court with proof of receipt as set out. Defendants request to prove expenses is granted and such proof is to be filed by 3/19/12. ANZ USA, et al. are to show cause by 4/2/12 why defendants' claim does not constitute a reasonable amount, as set out. The Court will TUS 4/3/12. Defendants' motion to voluntarily dismiss the counterclaim without prejudice is granted. Final judgment will be entered after determination of sanctions. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/5/2012. (cmj)
May 6, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 194 Motion/Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Speagle, at this time; denying 195 Motion to Strike; denying 196 Motion to Strike; granting 192 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, as set out and to be filed by 5/17/11; the request of Mr. Speagle and Mr. Zakaria for oral arguments will be address when the issues have been fully briefed by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. on 5/6/2011. (cmj)
March 3, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 176 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the claims asserted in this case by both ANZ International and ANZ USA be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A). The counterclaim filed by defendants shall remain pending. If it is defendants' intent not to proceed on the counterclaim, they should file the appropriate pleading by 3/14/2011 to dismiss the counterclaim. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/3/2011. (cmj)
September 9, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion to Clarify - FURTHER ORDERED that ANZ shall, no later than September 30, 2010, make the Responsive Media available to Stroz Friedberg as set out; STAYING 122 Motion for Issuance of a Rule to Show Cause; GRANTING 137 Mot ion to Vacate to the extent that all remaining deadlines presently set forth in the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order entered on September 29, 2009 (doc. 58) are hereby VACATED.; finding as moot 153 Motion for Limited Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/9/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
October 20, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Henry Crown & Company, Bush Hog, LLC, recommending that the motion for a more definite statement be d enied and that Defendants' alternative motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint be Granted as to Counts Six and Seven and denied as to all other counts. In light of this recommendation, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 55) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/20/09. (cmj)
September 29, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 MOTION for More Definite Statement and/or to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Henry Crown & Company, Bush Hog, LLC, recommending that the motion for a more definite statement be denied and that Defen dants' alternative motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint be Granted as to Counts Six and Seven and denied as to all other counts. In light of this recommendation, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 55) is denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/29/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANZ USA, LLC et al v. Bush Hog, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANZ USA, LLC
Represented By: Scott Michael Speagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANZ International Manufacturing Private Limited
Represented By: Scott Michael Speagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush Hog, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Crown & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?