Rogers v. Astrue
Plaintiff: John Rogers
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv00368
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Petitioner be awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $1765.97. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/29/2010. (tgw)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by John Rogers stating that Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act be GRANTED, in part and th at his attorney be awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $1,765.97 for 10.25 attorney hours spent representing Plaintiff in connection with this action. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/3/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order entered on this date. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security, denying Plaintiff's claim for disability insurance benefits, be REVERSED and REMANDED. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/10. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rogers
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?