Anderson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Delois B. Anderson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv00531
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Delois B. Anderson. This judgment shall constitute a separate document in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/19/2012. (sdb)
November 23, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Remand to Agency to Social Security Administration filed by Michael J. Astrue, recommending Defendant's motion be granted and this action be remanded to SS for further administrative action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/23/09. (cmj)
November 20, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Remand to Agency to Social Security Administration filed by Michael J. Astrue, recommending Defendant's motion be granted and this action be remanded to SS for further administrative action. Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/20/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delois B. Anderson
Represented By: R. Michael Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?