Lolley v. Louisiana Correctional Services et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Keith Lolley
Defendant: Louisiana Correctional Services and Perry County Correction Center
Case Number: 2:2009cv00555
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Perry
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, dismissing as moot plaintiff's ceremonial grounds claim. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/12/2012. (copy to pltf) (mab)
June 12, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Louisiana Correctional Services and against Daniel Keith Lolley. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/13/2012. (copy to pltf) (mab)
September 29, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dfts' MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED w/respect to Plf's claims re: desecration of religious items, deprivation of herbs, transfer to PCCC, lack of sweat lodge, & worship services, & his request for injunctive relief & punitive damages & DENIED w/respect to Plf's claim re: lack of ceremonial grounds. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/29/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 9, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Dfts Joe Doe I & John Doe II are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/9/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 6/9/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lolley v. Louisiana Correctional Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Keith Lolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry County Correction Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?