Bender v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Peggy Bender
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. and Ford Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00735
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion or Relief from Order of January 27, 2010 & denying 20 Motion to Reopen Case as set out. This Court lacks jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1447(d) to reconsider the remand order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/9/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
February 19, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peggy Bender, recommending that Plaintiff's motion be granted and that this action be remanded to the Wilcox County Circuit Court for all proceedings. Defendants' Motion to stay or certify for interlocutory appeal (doc. 17) is denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/18/2010. (cmj)
January 27, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peggy Bender, recommending that Plaintiff's motion be granted and that this action be remanded to the Wilcox County Circuit Court for all proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/26/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Bender
Represented By: Thomas P. Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Alexander Wyatt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?