Harden v. Peek et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Harden
Defendant: Kenneth Arlin Peek, Jr. and Poch Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00841
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/4/2011. (cmj)
May 5, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Kenny Harden, recommending Plaintiff's Motion to Remand be DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/2010. (cmj)
April 16, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Remand Second Notice of Removal and For Award of Fees and Expenses filed by Kenny Harden, recommending Plaintiff's Motion to Remand be DENIED as set out. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/16/2010. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden v. Peek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Harden
Represented By: Wyman O. Gilmore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Arlin Peek, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poch Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?