Jackson v. Municipality of Selma et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Jackson
Defendant: Municipality of Selma and Carlos Jones
Case Number: 2:2010cv00168
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/4/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
January 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Leave to File motion to remand or in the alternative leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/24/2011. (tgw)
May 24, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/24/10. (tgw)
April 29, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order ent. on Plaintiff's response to Defendant's notice of transfer 6 and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 7 that defendants' request for remand be DENIED for reasons as set out; Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/29/10. (mjn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Municipality of Selma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Jackson
Represented By: Rose M. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Selma
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Jones
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?