Johnson et al v. TMI Management Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Teresa Johnson and Teneace Johnson
Defendant: TMI Management Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00221
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs are awarded attorney's fees in the total amount of $20,102.00, and costs and expenses in the amount of $1,350.84. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/26/2012. (tgw)
August 7, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that default judgment will be entered in favor of plaintiff Teresa Johnson and against defendant TMI Management Systems, Inc. (as set out). A separate judgment will enter. Any petition for attorney's fees must be filed by 8/28/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/7/2012. (tgw)
March 1, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Clerk to enter a default against TMI Management Systems, Inc. The plaintiff is ordered by 3/16/2012 to file any motion for default judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/1/2012. Copy mailed to TMI Management Systems, Inc. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. TMI Management Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Johnson
Represented By: H. Wallace Blizzard
Represented By: Ann C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teneace Johnson
Represented By: Ann C. Robertson
Represented By: H. Wallace Blizzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMI Management Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?