Parker v. CGI Technologies and Solutions Inc.

Plaintiff: Alma Parker
Defendant: CGI Technologies and Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00288
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of CGI Technologies and Solutions Inc. against Alma Parker. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/21/2012. (cmj)
June 21, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Set Aside Judgment with the Court construing this as a motion to reconsider. Parker shall have until 7/9/12 to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment. CGI shall file any reply by 7/16/12. CGI to serve Parker with Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/20/2012. (order mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
May 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant CGI Technologies and against plaintiff Alma Parker, dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/11/2012. (copy of order and judgment mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. CGI Technologies and Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGI Technologies and Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer F Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?