Presley v. Bill Vann Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valerie K. Presley and Cleveland G. Kite
Defendant: Warrior 1-Stop Building Supply, Cameron International Corp., Bill Vann Company, Inc., Buffalo Pumps Inc., A.W. Chesterton Co., Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Motion Industries Inc., Honeywell International Inc., John Crane Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Inc., Gorman-Rupp Company, Caterpillar Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc., Eaton Corporation, Dana Holding Corporation, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc., Schneider Electric USA Inc., Viking Pump Inc., Sepco Corporation, Aurora Pump Co., Union Carbide Corporation, Crown Holdings Inc., CBS Corporation and Cummins Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00444
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 60 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/2015. (tgw)
December 9, 2015 REFERRAL OF #200 Notice of Settlement to Judge Steele. (tgw)
December 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Settlement Conference held on 12/7/2015. (srr)
December 7, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE of Settlement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Vercher, Michael)
December 4, 2015 REFERRAL OF #199 Notice of Settlement to Judge Steele. (tgw)
December 4, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE of Settlement by Honeywell International Inc. (Lankford, Frank)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order Setting Motion Deadlinere: #194 MOTION in Limine, #195 MOTION in Limine & #196 MOTION in Limine. Responses due by 1/8/2016, Replies due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/3/2015. (tgw)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order granting #192 MOTION for Leave to File corrected affidavit filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. Corrected Exhibit M is to be filed by 12/10/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/3/2015. (tgw)
December 3, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #194 MOTION in Limine To Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Richard L. Kradin, #195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff Expert David Rosner, P.H.D., #196 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Gerald Markowitz, PH.D. to Judge Steele (tgw)
December 2, 2015 Filing 196 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Gerald Markowitz, PH.D. by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
December 2, 2015 Filing 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff Expert David Rosner, P.H.D. by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
December 2, 2015 Filing 194 MOTION in Limine To Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Richard L. Kradin by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #192 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit and Request for Oral Argument filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. Responses due by 12/1/2015. The request for oral argument is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/19/2015. (tgw)
November 19, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #192 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit and Request for Oral Argument to Judge Steele (tgw)
November 18, 2015 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit and Request for Oral Argument by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order on the #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 12/11/2015. Replies to Response to S/J due by 12/28/2015. The motion will be taken under submission on 12/28/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/16/2015. (tgw)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #186 MOTION to Strike filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. Responses due by 12/11/2015, Replies due by 12/28/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/16/2015. (tgw)
November 16, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Judge Steele (tgw)
November 13, 2015 Filing 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cameron International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (McCloud, Stewart)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order on the #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 12/11/2015. Replies to Response to S/J due by 12/28/2015. The motion will be taken under submission on 12/28/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/2015. (tgw)
November 13, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Judge Steele (tgw)
November 13, 2015 Filing 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Determinations of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M) (Sprain, Robert)
November 13, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #186 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Plaintiff's Inadmissible Evidence to Judge Steele (tgw)
November 12, 2015 Filing 186 MOTION to Strike and Objections to Plaintiff's Inadmissible Evidence by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Sprain, Robert)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Order setting a Settlement Conference for 12/7/2015 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/5/2015. (tgw)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order re: #183 Position Regarding Settlement filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Cameron International Corp., Crane Co. Counsel for one of the parties is directed to call chambers to request a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/3/2015. (tgw)
October 30, 2015 REFERRAL OF #183 Position Regarding Settlement to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
October 30, 2015 Filing 183 Position Regarding Settlement Joint Statement Regarding Settlement filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc., Cameron International Corp., Crane Co., Honeywell International Inc.. (McCloud, Stewart)
October 15, 2015 Filing 182 Notice of Filing Notice of Telephonic Deposition of Richard Kradin, M.D. filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
October 14, 2015 Filing 181 Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Deposition of David Rosner, PhD filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re: #177 Stipulation of Dismissal, construed as a motion. The motion is granted. The plaintiff's claims against Dana Companies LLC are dismissed with prejudice without taxation of costs. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/9/2015. (tgw)
October 8, 2015 Filing 179 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of David Rosner, Ph.D. filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order re: #177 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dana Companies LLC. The Court concludes that plaintiff and Dana intended their stipulation to serve as a motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims against Dana. Any party opposing the deemed motion should file an objection by 10/8/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/1/2015. (mbp)
September 30, 2015 REFERRAL OF #177 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Steele. (tgw)
September 30, 2015 Filing 177 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Dana Companies, LLC) (Davis, Evelyn)
September 28, 2015 Filing 176 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of Richard L. Kradin, M.D. filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
September 15, 2015 Filing 175 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of William E. Longo, Ph.D. filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER finding as moot #173 Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/8/2015. (mbp)
September 4, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #173 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Expert Disclosures - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
September 4, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Expert Disclosures by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
August 26, 2015 Filing 172 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying #131 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron International Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/2015. (tgw)
August 4, 2015 Filing 170 JUDGMENT: The plaintiff shall have and recover nothing of defendant Cummins, Inc. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant Cummins, Inc. and against plaintiff Valerie K. Presley, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Cleveland G. Kite, deceased. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/2015. (tgw)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cummins, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/2015. (tgw)
July 24, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE by Crane Co. Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information (Clarke, Timothy)
July 15, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wayne Heath on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Heath, Robert)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The STAY previously entered is LIFTED. Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2016 03:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 10/23/2015. SJ or Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/15 and Motions on the issue of causation are due by 11/13/2015. Jury Selection set for 5/3/2016 08:45 AM in MOBILE in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of May 2016 in MOBILE. Position Regarding Settlement due by 10/30/2015. The #154 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
June 25, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by David Carl Williams, Jr on behalf of Cummins Inc., Warren Pumps LLC (Williams, David)
June 25, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2015. FTR Digital Audio Recording. (srr) Modified on 6/25/2015 (srr).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Order setting a Scheduling Conference for 6/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/15/2015. (tgw)
June 15, 2015 Filing 162 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Notice To The Court #161 filed by Cummins Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Cameron International Corp., Crane Co. (Steele, William)
June 10, 2015 REFERRAL OF #161 Notice to the Court re: MDL to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
June 9, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE by Cameron International Corp., Crane Co., Cummins Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McCloud, Stewart)
April 3, 2015 REFERRAL OF #160 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 2, 2015 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion #154 , #131 , #130 filed by Cameron International Corp.. (McCloud, Stewart)
April 1, 2015 REFERRAL OF #159 Reply Brief to Judge Steele. (tgw)
March 31, 2015 Filing 159 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Cummins Inc. re: #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #152 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Cummins Inc.. (Mills, William)
March 31, 2015 REFERRAL OF #158 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
March 30, 2015 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order of February 27, 2015, #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron International Corp.. (McCloud, Stewart)
March 30, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE by Cummins Inc. (Mills, William)
March 30, 2015 REFERRAL OF #155 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Order re: #154 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Valerie K. Presley. The Court will defer ruling on the motion pending disposition of the pending motion to re-transfer to MDL. All Scheduling Order deadlines are STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/27/2015. (tgw)
March 27, 2015 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order of February 27, 2015 filed by Cummins Inc.. (Mills, William)
March 26, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #154 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order of February 27, 2015 - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
March 25, 2015 Filing 154 Second MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order of February 27, 2015 by Valerie K. Presley. (Graham, Kevin)
March 23, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Graham on behalf of Valerie K. Presley (Graham, Kevin)
March 20, 2015 REFERRAL OF #151 Response in Opposition to Motion, #152 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Steele. (tgw)
March 19, 2015 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Valerie K. Presley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Z) (Keahey, Grover)
March 19, 2015 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Valerie K. Presley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Z) (Keahey, Grover)
March 17, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE by Valerie K. Presley re #149 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Motion to Withdraw and Refiling under the Correct Event in the JPML (Keahey, Grover)
March 16, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE by Valerie K. Presley re #147 Notice (Other),,, Notice of Filing Amendment to Plaintiff's Tag-Along Motion to Transfer to JPML (Keahey, Grover)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order granting #133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Crown Holdings Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc. All claims against the Crown defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/16/2015. (tgw)
March 13, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE by Valerie K. Presley re #144 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Tag-Along Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief In Support of Plaintiff's Tag-Along Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A. Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Tag-Along Motion, #3 Exhibit B. Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit C. Defendants' Notice of Removal to ALSD, #5 Exhibit D. Defendants' Notice of Tag-Along, #6 Exhibit E. Plaintiff's Objection to Tag-Along, #7 Exhibit F. MDL 875 Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit G. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Expert, #9 Exhibit H. Cummins Dispositive Motion, #10 Exhibit I. Cameron's Dispositive Motion, #11 Exhibit Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief via Notice of Filing in the ALSD) (Keahey, Grover)
March 13, 2015 REFERRAL OF #146 Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer to Judge Steele. (tgw)
March 12, 2015 Filing 146 Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer. (McCloud, Stewart)
March 12, 2015 Filing 145 (Document contains only the Certificate of Service page. Entire document refiled at Doc. #146 ) Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Motion to Transfer. (McCloud, Stewart) Modified on 3/13/2015 (tgw).
March 9, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE by Valerie K. Presley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Tag-Along Motion to Transfer, Brief in Support, et al) (Keahey, Grover)
March 6, 2015 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Notice of Filing Motion To Transfer by Grover Patterson Keahey, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit Separation of Claims, #4 Exhibit Oder to File Joint Status Report, #5 Exhibit Joint Status Report, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amendment & Clarification of Joint Status Report, #7 Exhibit Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion & Clarification of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, #10 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, #11 Exhibit ALSD Notice of Filing, #12 Exhibit Complaint & Docket Sheet) (Keahey, Grover)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Clarify the Scheduling Order. Section 9 of the #140 Scheduling Order is amended as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/3/2015. (tgw)
March 3, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #141 MOTION to Clarify Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order- Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
March 2, 2015 Filing 141 MOTION to Clarify Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by Cleveland G. Kite, Valerie K. Presley. (Keahey, Grover)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2015 02:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Supplemental Discovery to be completed by 6/19/2015. Motions due by 7/10/2015, with responses due by 7/31/15 & replies due by 8/14/15. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2015 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of November 2015. Any party who desires a jury venire drawn from the district-at-large shall file a notice with the Court by 3/30/2015. Position Regarding Settlement due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
February 27, 2015 REFERRAL OF #139 Plaintiff's Amendment to and Clarification of Joint Status Report to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
February 26, 2015 Filing 139 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cleveland G. Kite, Valerie K. Presley. Plaintiff's Amendment to and Clarification of Joint Status Report. (Keahey, Grover)
February 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Status Conference held on 2/24/2015. FTR Digital Audio Recording. (srr)
February 24, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE by Cleveland G. Kite, Valerie K. Presley Of the Appearance of Kevin D. Graham, Esq. at Status Conference Set for Feb. 24, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed copy of NOA) (Keahey, Grover)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order on the #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment & #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 3/19/2015. Replies to Response to S/J due by 4/2/2015. The motions will be taken under submission on 4/2/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/19/2015. (tgw)
February 19, 2015 REFERRAL OF #135 Status Report to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
February 18, 2015 Filing 135 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Cummins Inc.. (Mills, William)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order re: #133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Crown Holdings Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/2015. (tgw)
February 18, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #130 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment & #133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (tgw)
February 18, 2015 Filing 133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
February 16, 2015 Filing 132 Memorandum in Support re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cameron International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Cameron International Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment) (McCloud, Stewart)
February 16, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cameron International Corp.. (McCloud, Stewart)
February 16, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cummins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Cummins Motion for Summary Judgment) (Mills, William)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ENDORSED ORDER granting #128 Notice of Withdrawal of Michael J. Zukowski, construed as co-counsel's Motion to Permit Michael J. Zukowski to Withdraw as Counsel (see SD ALA LR 83.5(h) (providing that counsel of record must obtain court permission to withdraw from representation but that the court may "permit withdrawal without formal motion and notice if other counsel has entered his or her appearance for the party"). Attorney Michael J. Zukowski terminated as counsel for Defendant Crane Co. in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/13/2015. (ctn)
February 13, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #128 MOTION for Michael J. Zukowski to Withdraw as Attorney - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
February 12, 2015 Filing 128 MOTION for Michael J. Zukowski to Withdraw as Attorney by Crane Co.. (Clarke, Timothy)
February 6, 2015 Filing 126 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Michael J. Zukowski; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order directing the parties to file a joint status report by 2/18/2015. A Status/Scheduling Conference is set for 2/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/5/2015. Copy mailed to Michael J. Zukowski. (tgw)
February 5, 2015 Filing 125 SEPARATION OF CLAIMS AND REMAND ORDER received from MDL Panel remanding this action from Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. All claims except for the severed claims for punitive or exemplary damages are remanded. (Attachments: #1 PAED Docket Sheet) (tgw)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order re: #123 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. The movants have not explained how this Court could retain jurisdiction to dismiss parties from a case that has been transferred to another district. Accordingly, the stipulation, construed as a motion, is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/29/2012. (tgw)
May 25, 2012 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Waudby, William)
January 10, 2012 Filing 122 Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Continuation of Deposition of C. Kite filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/5/2012. (srr)
January 5, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION for William L. Waudby to Withdraw as Attorney by Caterpillar Inc.. (Waudby, William)
January 4, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine McIntyre Best on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Best, Kristine)
December 20, 2011 Filing 118 Notice of Filing Notice of TPV Deposition filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
November 7, 2011 Filing 117 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of action. Case Closed. (tgw)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ENDORSED ORDER granting #112 Motion filed by Evelyn F. Davis of the law firm of Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP (formerly known as Hawkins & Parnell, LLP), to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation and substitute John A. Earnhardt and Gregg M. McCormick of the law firm of Maynard Cooper & Gale PC. Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/4/2011. (dhf)
November 2, 2011 Filing 115 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #113 filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Katherine)
November 2, 2011 Filing 114 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #113 filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Steele, William)
November 2, 2011 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Earnhardt, John)
November 2, 2011 Filing 112 MOTION for Evelyn F. Davis to Withdraw as Attorney AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Union Carbide Corporation. (Davis, Evelyn)
November 2, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Mitchel McCormick on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (McCormick, Gregg)
November 2, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by John Aaron Earnhardt on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Earnhardt, John)
November 1, 2011 Filing 109 Notice of Filing Notice of Plaintiff's Trial Deposition Video filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
October 21, 2011 Filing 108 Notice of Filing Notice of Taking of Deposition of Cleveland Kite filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #58 Motion for expedited consideration of motion for remand; denying #59 & #90 Motions to Remand; denying as moot the #88 & #89 Motions to exclude evidence. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/29/2011. (tgw)
September 22, 2011 Filing 105 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #94 filed by Crane Co. (Steele, William)
September 22, 2011 Filing 104 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #93 filed by Bill Vann Company, Inc. (Steele, William)
September 22, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
September 12, 2011 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavits re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, MOTION Exclusion of Affidavits re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #67 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #89 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavit re #70 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Notice of Filing Exhibits filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Harris, James)
September 8, 2011 Filing 101 Attorney Admission Letter emailed (via ECF) to Robert H. Sprain, Jr.; Attorney to comply by 9/19/2011. (tgw)
September 8, 2011 Filing 100 Attorney Admission Letter emailed (via ECF) to Joi C. Scott; Attorney to comply by 9/19/2011. (tgw)
September 8, 2011 Filing 99 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to G. Stephen Wiggins; Attorney to comply by 9/19/2011. (tgw)
September 8, 2011 Filing 98 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Catherine A. McCormack; Attorney to comply by 9/19/2011. (tgw)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order: The plaintiff has submitted approximately 740 pages of exhibits with his replybriefs. (Docs. 87, 91, 92). The plaintiff is ordered to furnish the Court, on or beforeSeptember 12, 2011, a hard copy of these exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/8/2011. Copy mailed to Catherine McCormack & G. Stephen Wiggins. (tgw)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order re: #88 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavits & #89 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavits. Responses due by 9/12/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/8/2011. Copy mailed to Catherine McCormack & G. Stephen Wiggins. (tgw)
September 6, 2011 Filing 95 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #94 filed by Crane Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement #93 filed by Bill Vann Company, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action (jsc)
September 2, 2011 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
September 2, 2011 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
September 2, 2011 Filing 92 REPLY to #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion To Remand filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
September 2, 2011 Filing 91 RESPONSE to #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, To Remand filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Yost Decision, Ex. A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
September 2, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION to Remand Based on Additional Grounds by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
September 2, 2011 Filing 89 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavit re #70 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Notice of Filing Exhibits by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
September 2, 2011 Filing 88 MOTION Exclusion of Affidavits re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Notice of Filing Exhibits, #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
September 2, 2011 Filing 87 REPLY to #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand to State Court filed by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
August 30, 2011 Filing 86 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #77 filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation (dhf)
August 29, 2011 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Davis, Evelyn)
August 29, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Dana Holding Corporation (Davis, Evelyn)
August 29, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Davis, Evelyn)
August 29, 2011 Filing 82 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #77 filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Steele, William)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order STRIKING the #69 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Crane Co. for reasons as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/29/2011. Copy mailed to Catherine McCormack, G. Stephen Wiggins & Katherine Collier (tgw)
August 26, 2011 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J1, #2 Exhibit J2, #3 Exhibit J3, #4 Exhibit J4) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I1, #2 Exhibit I2, #3 Exhibit I3, #4 Exhibit I4, #5 Exhibit I5, #6 Exhibit I6) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
August 26, 2011 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
August 26, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H1, #2 Exhibit H2, #3 Exhibit H3, #4 Exhibit H4, #5 Exhibit H5) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Sargent, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1, #5 Exhibit C2, #6 Exhibit C3) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cummins Inc., Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit L to Sargent Aff., #2 Exhibit Exhibit P to Sargent Aff., #3 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Sargent Aff.) (Mills, William)
August 26, 2011 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court (Joinder) filed by Bill Vann Company, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
August 26, 2011 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cummins Inc., Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. B - Horne Aff., #2 Exhibit Ex. C - Doktor Aff., #3 Exhibit Ex. D - Forman Aff., #4 Exhibit Ex. E - Kite Depo tr., #5 Exhibit Ex. F - Deed of Cession, #6 Exhibit Ex. G - MDL Statistics, #7 Exhibit Ex. H - Docket Sheet for Montgomery) (Mills, William)
August 26, 2011 Filing 69 (STRICKEN PER #81 ORDER) RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Redditt, F.)
August 26, 2011 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cummins Inc., Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Submission, #2 Affidavit Sargent Aff. w. exhibits (less LPQ)) (Mills, William)
August 26, 2011 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposition, #2 Exhibit B to Opposition, #3 Exhibit C to Opposition, #4 Exhibit D to Opposition, #5 Exhibit E to Opposition) (Harris, James)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order granting the #65 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. Buffalo Pumps is ordered to file its brief in opposition by 8/26/2011. Plaintiff's reply is due by 9/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/26/2011. Copies to parties. (tgw)
August 26, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit to Opposition) (McDonough, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order granting the #63 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by CBS Corporation. CBS is ordered to file its brief in opposition by 8/26/2011. Plaintiff's reply is due by 9/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/26/2011. Copies to parties. (tgw)
August 25, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Opposition, #3 Exhibit B to Opposition, #4 Exhibit C to Opposition, #5 Exhibit D to Opposition, #6 Exhibit E to Opposition) (Harris, James)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Amended Order: The second footnote of the Court's August 19 order is amended to read as follows: The plaintiff is further ordered to furnish the Court, on or beforeAugust 26, 2011, a hard copy of the exhibits to his motion for remand. The defendants are ordered to furnish the Court, on or before August 26, 2011, a hard copy of any exhibits supporting their responsive brief, of all iterations of the complaint, and of any other documents in the clerk's record they deem relevant to the motion for remand. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/23/2011. Copies to parties. (tgw)
August 22, 2011 Filing 61 Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #53 filed by Cameron International Corp., Corporate Disclosure Statement #56 filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #54 filed by A.W. Chesterton Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement #50 filed by Aurora Pump Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement #55 filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Steele, William)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Setting Motion Deadlines re: #59 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #58 Plaintiff's Motion for and Brief in Support For Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand filed by Cleveland G. Kite. Responses due by 8/26/2011. Replies due by 9/2/2011. Motion to be taken under submission on 9/2/2011. Parties are further ordered to file additional documentation as further set out by 8/26/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/19/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 18, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION to Remand by Cleveland G. Kite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B-1 to Memorandum in Suppport, #3 Exhibit Ex. B-2 to Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit Ex. C to Memorandum in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover) Modified on 8/19/2011 (tgw).
August 18, 2011 Filing 58 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion for and Brief in Support For Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand by Cleveland G. Kite. (Keahey, Grover)
August 18, 2011 Filing 57 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #53 filed by Cameron International Corp., Corporate Disclosure Statement #56 filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #54 filed by A.W. Chesterton Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement #55 filed by Flowserve Corporation. (dhf)
August 18, 2011 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
August 18, 2011 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (McDonough, Edward)
August 18, 2011 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co.. (McDonough, Edward)
August 17, 2011 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cameron International Corp.. (Rodgers, Christopher)
August 16, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE by Buffalo Pumps Inc. Tag-Along Action (McDonough, Edward)
August 16, 2011 Filing 51 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #50 filed by Aurora Pump Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement #48 filed by Warrior 1-Stop Building Supply, Corporate Disclosure Statement #46 filed by Goulds Pumps Inc. (dhf)
August 15, 2011 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Aurora Pump Co., Pentair Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Inc. for Aurora Pump Co... (Walters, Jennifer)
August 15, 2011 Filing 49 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #48 filed by Warrior 1-Stop Building Supply. (Steele, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Warrior 1-Stop Building Supply. (Wiggins, Raley)
August 15, 2011 Filing 47 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #46 filed by Goulds Pumps Inc. (Steele, William)
August 15, 2011 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps Inc.. (Clarke, Timothy)
August 15, 2011 Filing 45 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #43 filed by Georgia-Pacific LLC (dhf)
August 13, 2011 Filing 44 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #43 filed by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Steele, William)
August 12, 2011 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
August 12, 2011 Filing 42 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #40 filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. (dhf)
August 11, 2011 Filing 41 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #40 filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc. (Steele, William)
August 11, 2011 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
August 10, 2011 Filing 39 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #37 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Nelson, Katherine)
August 10, 2011 Filing 38 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #37 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Steele, William)
August 10, 2011 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, MetLife, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Scott, Joi)
August 10, 2011 Filing 36 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by John Crane Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #33 filed by Gorman-Rupp Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #34 filed by Crown Holdings Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #29 filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #28 filed by Caterpillar Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 filed by Honeywell International Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by Sepco Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #24 filed by Motion Industries Inc. (Nelson, Katherine)
August 10, 2011 Filing 35 Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by John Crane Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #33 filed by Gorman-Rupp Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement #34 filed by Crown Holdings Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #29 filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement #28 filed by Caterpillar Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 filed by Honeywell International Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by Sepco Corporation. (Steele, William)
August 10, 2011 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
August 10, 2011 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Gorman-Rupp Company. (McCloud, Stewart)
August 10, 2011 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Sepco Corporation. (McCloud, Stewart)
August 10, 2011 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (McCloud, Stewart)
August 10, 2011 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant John Crane Inc.. (McCloud, Stewart)
August 10, 2011 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
August 10, 2011 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Caterpillar Inc.. (Waudby, William)
August 10, 2011 Filing 27 Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Eaton Corporation; Corporate Disclosure Statement #24 filed by Motion Industries Inc. (Steele, William)
August 10, 2011 Filing 26 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Eaton Corporation. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action (dhf)
August 9, 2011 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Smyth, John)
August 9, 2011 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Motion Industries Inc., Genuine Parts Company identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for Motion Industries Inc... (Northcutt, Robert)
August 9, 2011 Filing 23 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by General Electric Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #17 filed by CBS Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #21 filed by Viking Pump Inc. Review of these corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action (dhf)
August 8, 2011 Filing 22 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #21 filed by Viking Pump Inc. (Steele, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Viking Pump Inc.. (Partridge, Donald)
August 8, 2011 Filing 20 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by General Electric Company. (Steele, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
August 8, 2011 Filing 18 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #17 filed by CBS Corporation. (Steele, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
August 8, 2011 Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Cummins Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Warren Pumps LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. Review of these corporate disclosure statements pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action (dhf)
August 8, 2011 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Steele, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Cummins Inc. (Steele, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. (Steele, William)
August 5, 2011 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #7 Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 8-A, #3 Exhibit 9) (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #7 Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 7-A, #3 Exhibit 7-B, #4 Exhibit 7-C, #5 Exhibit 7-D, #6 Exhibit 7-E, #7 Exhibit 7-F, #8 Exhibit 7-G, #9 Exhibit 7-H, #10 Exhibit 7-I) (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #7 Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 6-A, #3 Exhibit 6-B, #4 Exhibit 6-C) (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Buffalo Pumps Inc. re: #7 Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-D, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5) (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 7 Joinder in NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Buffalo Pumps Inc. () (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 3, 3-A) (McDonough, Edward)
August 5, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE by CBS Corporation of Consent to Removal (Harris, James)
August 5, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE by Warren Pumps LLC of Tag-Along Action (Mills, William)
August 5, 2011 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Warren Pumps LLC, Colfax Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC.. (Mills, William)
August 5, 2011 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cummins Inc.. (Mills, William)
August 5, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Notice of Removal by Cummins Inc., Warren Pumps LLC re: #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Continuation of State Court Clerk's Record, #2 Exhibit E - Continuation of State Court Clerk's Record, #3 Exhibit E - Continuation of State Court Clerk's Record, #4 Exhibit E - Continuation of State Court Clerk's Record) (Mills, William)
August 5, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Warren Pumps LLC, Cummins Inc. from Circuit Court of Marengo County, Alabama, case number CV-2011-900034. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt number 1128-1130817, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Warren Pumps LLC, Cummins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Kite, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Roland Doktor, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Illinois General Laws of 1899, pp. 375-76, #4 Exhibit D - Consents and Joinders in Removal based on Federal Enclave Jurisdiction, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Clerk's Record) (Mills, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2011: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presley v. Bill Vann Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warrior 1-Stop Building Supply
Represented By: Gary Stephen Wiggins
Represented By: Raley Livingston Wiggins
Represented By: Christopher L. McIlwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corp.
Represented By: Christopher S. Rodgers
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Vann Company, Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Zukowski
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: William T. Mills, II
Represented By: David Carl Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joi C. Scott
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: S. Allen Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Jenelle R. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Catherine Ann McCormack
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Industries Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Represented By: Jenelle R. Evans
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Represented By: Kristine McIntyre Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Sprain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Ann Collier
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Holding Corporation
Represented By: Catherine Ann McCormack
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Allan R. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Co. Inc.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Walter T. Gilmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Thompson Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Gregg Mitchel McCormick
Represented By: John Aaron Earnhardt
Represented By: Catherine Ann McCormack
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Walter T. Gilmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Represented By: James A. Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: William T. Mills, II
Represented By: David Carl Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Wayne Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie K. Presley
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Represented By: Kevin D. Graham
Represented By: Grover Patterson Keahey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland G. Kite
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Represented By: Grover Patterson Keahey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?