Gill v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Ashley Gill
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Sirote & Permutt, PC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00162
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: Case is remanded back to Dallas County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/6/2016. (srd)
June 28, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Gill and 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted as to each Plaintiff's claims found in Count 14 and granted in part as to the individual claim found in Count 16. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment as to Count 16 is denied in part as to the individual claim. The still pending portions of the motions for summary judgment remain under consideration. The parties shall brief the Court, as set out, before 7/5/16 and any responses shall be filed by 7/12/16. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/28/2016. (cmj)
June 9, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/9/2016. (cmj)
June 17, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ashley Gill. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 11) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/16/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gill
Represented By: Roderick D. Graham(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt, PC
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?