Arnold v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Annie Arnold
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00148
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order GRANTING parties' 180 Joint MOTION for Approval of Agreed Proposed Class Notice as set out. State Farm is to provide Plf with the names & last known mailing addresses of all potential class members by 3/10/2021. State Farm is also ord ered to provide Plf, in writing, the methodology it used for identifying potential class member by 2/23/2021. The parties are to present any dispute regarding the methodology for identifying potential class members to the Court NLT 3/3/2021. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/10/21. (tot)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Dft State Farm's 119 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/23/2020. (tot)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Dft State Farm's 122 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Toby Johnson is DENIED as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/30/2020. (tot)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Order GRANTING 158 MOTION and APPLICATION for Allison N. Siebeneck to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/16/2020. (srd)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order GRANTING Plf's 86 Unopposed MOTION to Seal as modified by Docs. 94 & 95 & this Order as set out. Plf's 95 Brief is construed as a motion to re-file Exhibits B & V to Plf's motion for class certification & is GRANTED as set out. Dft's 94 Memorandum is construed as a motion to seal & is GRANTED to the extent as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal Exhibits X, Y, AA & EE & the 88 Memorandum in Support of Plf's Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives & Appointment of Class Counsel as set out Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/29/19. (tot)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Section 1292(b) findings, certification of question, and reconsideration; granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/14/2017. (tgw)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 19 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/3/2017. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Arnold
Represented By: Philip Fairbanks
Represented By: David P. Martin
Represented By: Mendel Austin Mehr
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Tal C. Chaiken
Represented By: Heidi Dalenberg
Represented By: Jacob L Kahn
Represented By: James B. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?