Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ryan & James LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Catrinna Perry, Ryan Perry, James Warren and Ryan & James LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00493
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Catrinna Perry, Ryan Perry, Ryan & James LLC, James Warren. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Cassady, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Gamble, F.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gamble, F.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catrinna Perry, Ryan Perry, Ryan & James LLC, James Warren ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2311932, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Gamble, F.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ryan & James LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catrinna Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan & James LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?