Cool Tops, Inc. v. Safford Trading Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Cool Tops, Inc.
Defendant: Safford Trading Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Sonja F Bivins
1 Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Closing per doc. 6. No order will be entered. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F. 3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012) (nah)
March 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cool Tops, Inc. (Huffaker, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Cool Tops, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Cool Tops, Inc.. (Huffaker, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Safford Trading Company, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Cool Tops, Inc. (Huffaker, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Safford Trading Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2332355, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Cool Tops, Inc.. (Bailey, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cool Tops, Inc. v. Safford Trading Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safford Trading Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cool Tops, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Austin Huffaker, Jr.
Represented By: John Evans Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?