Thornton v. Credit Acceptance Corporation

Plaintiff: Doris Thornton
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00058
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Joseph C. Hoeffel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tot)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Doris Thornton re #5 MOTION for Joseph C. Hoeffel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2378498, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hoeffel, Joseph)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Joseph C. Hoeffel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2378498, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Doris Thornton. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A- Attorney's Admission List, #4 Exhibit B- Certificates of Good Standing) (Hoeffel, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Thornton. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019 (Hoeffel, Joseph)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Service Notice entered 2/11/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/25/2011. (tot)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Credit Acceptance Corporation. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Acceptance Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2347124, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Doris Thornton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons) (Hoeffel, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Thornton
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoeffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?