Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Henry

Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: John Crawford Henry
Case Number: 2:2019cv00151
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURES (Sefton, Patrick)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by John Crawford Henry. (Cowan, David)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Non-Jury Trial to be set during the month of May 2020. Discovery cutoff 12/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 1/10/2020. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Supplement to Rule 26(f) Report to Judge Milling. (tgw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Supplement to #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Cowan, David)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order directing the defendant to file a Supplement to the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/18/2019. (tgw) Modified on 6/18/2019 (tgw).
June 17, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (tgw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (tgw)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Crawford Henry. (Cowan, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. John Crawford Henry served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019 (Sefton, Patrick)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 3/29/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/13/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/29/2019. (tgw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Crawford Henry. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. (Sefton, Patrick)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Crawford Henry ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2375760, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Customer Profile, #2 Exhibit B - Account Ledger, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Sefton, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crawford Henry
Represented By: David M. Cowan
Represented By: Frederick P. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick L.W. Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?