Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc. v. Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc.
Defendant: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00704
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Marengo County, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/24/2019. (nah)
October 15, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Bivins. (nah)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Stockham, Connie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 filed by Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc. Defendant Response due by 10/16/2019. Plaintiff Reply due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/02/2019. (nah)
October 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (clr)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc.. (Dinning, Woodford)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Stockham, Connie)
September 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Remand) (Dinning, Woodford)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Marengo County, Alabama, case number 48-CV-2019-900006. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2480645, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stockham, Connie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc. v. Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personal Touch by JR Rivas, Inc.
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hannah Mebane Thrasher
Represented By: Connie Ray Stockham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?