Watts v. SMP Automotive
Plaintiff: Shawalto Watts
Defendant: SMP Automotive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00907
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file another Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees on the Court's form on or before 1/2/2020 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/05/2019. (Copy of Order and IFP form mailed to Plaintiff as directed) (nah)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shawalto Watts. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SMP Automotive, filed by Shawalto Watts - Ref to MJ/Milling (PSU). (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. SMP Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMP Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawalto Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?