Adams et al v. Demopolis City Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Janice Adams and Jasmine Adams
Defendant: Tracy Stewart, Kyle Kallhoff, Gloria Mims, Demopolis City Schools, Tori Infinger and U.S. Jones Elementary School
Case Number: 2:2020cv00027
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/13/2020. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Demopolis City Schools, Tori Infinger, Kyle Kallhoff, Gloria Mims, Tracy Stewart, U.S. Jones Elementary School. (Carr, Clay)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Boardman on behalf of Demopolis City Schools, Tori Infinger, Kyle Kallhoff, Gloria Mims, Tracy Stewart, U.S. Jones Elementary School (Boardman, Mark)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, as to Gloria Mims Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USPS Domestic Return Receipt) (Debrosse, Diandra)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, as to Tori Infinger Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USPS Domestic Return Receipt) (Debrosse, Diandra)
February 4, 2020 Answer due from Tori Infinger and Gloria Mims pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (mab)
January 29, 2020 Answer due from Kyle Kallhoff, Tracy Stewart pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Docs. #8 & #9 . (tot)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, as to Tracy Stewart Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USPS Domestic Receipt) (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, as to Kyle Kallhoff Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement USPS Domestic Receipt) (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued to Tracy Stewart Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued to Kyle Kallhoff Acknowledgement filed by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Jones Elementary School by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. U.S. Jones Elementary School served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020 (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Demopolis City Schools Board of Education by Janice Adams, Jasmine Adams. Demopolis City Schools served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020 (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Demopolis City Schools, Tori Infinger, Kyle Kallhoff, Gloria Mims, Tracy Stewart, U.S. Jones Elementary School. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Debrosse, Diandra)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2550871, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Debrosse, Diandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Demopolis City Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Kallhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demopolis City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Infinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Jones Elementary School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Adams
Represented By: Diandra S. Debrosse Zimmermann
Represented By: Diandra S. Debrosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Adams
Represented By: Diandra S. Debrosse Zimmermann
Represented By: Diandra S. Debrosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?