Crum et al v. Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Le'Asia Ann Crum and Jacqueline Malone
Defendant: Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Cosby-Carmichael, Inc., Jones Tire, LLC doing business as Jones Tire of Selma, Hankook Tire America Corp., Hankook Tire Company, LTD. and Jones Interstate Tire Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00452
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 REFERRAL OF #10 Reply Brief to Judge Nelson. (srd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Le'Asia Ann Crum, Jacqueline Malone re: #7 MOTION to Remand , #9 Response filed by Le'Asia Ann Crum, Jacqueline Malone. (Boone, LaBarron)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Hankook Tire America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hargrove, Alan)
October 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #9 Response to Judge Nelson. (srd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jacqueline Malone, Le'Asia Ann Crum. District Judge referred said motion to Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (10/9/2020 elec. ref.). Defendants' brief(s) in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Thurs. 10/22/2020. Plaintiffs' brief(s) in reply to the response(s), if any, must be filed and served no later than Thurs. 10/29/2020. See S.D. Ala. CivLR 7 for briefing technical requirements. Motion to be taken under submission on Fri. 10/30/2020. Once the motion is under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/9/2020. (ctn)
October 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 MOTION to Remand to Judge Nelson. (srd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Boone, LaBarron)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed #3 Motion to Stay, see #5 , as follows: The Preliminary Scheduling Order #2 is VACATED, and the parties' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conferencing obligation is STAYED until otherwise ordered. If no motion to remand is filed by Tues. 10/13/2020, a new Preliminary Scheduling Order shall issue forthwith. If a motion to remand is filed by that date, a new Preliminary Scheduling Order will be entered in due course following disposition of the motion to remand, if appropriate. In light of the anticipated motion to remand, the Court finds good cause to delay entry of a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling order until after its disposition. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/25/2020. (ctn)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to #3 MOTION to Stay Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Hankook Tire America Corp.. (Hargrove, Alan)
September 24, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Reply to Judge Nelson. (srd)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Jacqueline Malone, Le'Asia Ann Crum. District Judge referred motion to Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (9/18/2020 elec. ref.). Defendants' brief in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Thurs. 9/24/2020. Plaintiffs' brief in reply to the response, if any, must be filed and served no later than Mon 9/28/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on Tues. 9/29/2020. Once the motion is under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/18/2020. (ctn)
September 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Stay Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay filed by Le'Asia Ann Crum, Jacqueline Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order) (Boone, LaBarron)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 VACATED - PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 09/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd) Modified on 9/28/2020 (srd).
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2676877, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Hankook Tire America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Hargrove, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum et al v. Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Manufacturing Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Morgan Eason Chappell
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: R. Brett Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosby-Carmichael, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Webster
Represented By: Woodruff Rives Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Tire, LLC doing business as Jones Tire of Selma
Represented By: Jud Clifford Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire America Corp.
Represented By: Morgan Eason Chappell
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: R. Brett Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Company, LTD.
Represented By: Morgan Eason Chappell
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: R. Brett Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Interstate Tire Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Stewart Tuley
Represented By: Zachary P. Trader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le'Asia Ann Crum
Represented By: LaBarron N. Boone
Represented By: Dana Taunton
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Malone
Represented By: LaBarron N. Boone
Represented By: Dana Taunton
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?