Cunningham v. Saul
Plaintiff: Pamela Cunningham
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00482
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/16/2020 as to Attorney General. (srd)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Attorney's Office. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 10/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (srd)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver McDonald on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (McDonald, Oliver)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 09/30/2020. (srd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul(SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #1 Cert Mail Receipts) (srd).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/30/2020. (bld)
September 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pamela Cunningham. (Coplin, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Pamela Cunningham. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Cunningham
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?