Shannon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tenekia Shannon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00490
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/26/2020 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 10/23/2020 as to U.S. Attorney General (srd)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew Saul (Todd, Victoria)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Saul served on 10/15/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (srd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/13/2020. (srd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul (SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/9/2020. (bld)
October 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tenekia Shannon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grecu, Monica)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tenekia Shannon. (Grecu, Monica)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( IFP.), filed by Tenekia Shannon. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/6/2021. (Grecu, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenekia Shannon
Represented By: Monica H. Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?